Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471562 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471562



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 231
12.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.08.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
04.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 51
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 11
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 44