Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471720

EP3471720 - FORMULATION FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF UREMIC PRURITUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 05.02.2020 [2020/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Drug Delivery Solutions APS
Agern Alle 24-26
2970 Hoersholm / DK
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MENNE, Torkil
(c/o MC2 Biotek ApS)
Agern Alle 24-26
2970 Hoersholm / DK
02 / SELMER, Johan
(c/o MC2 Biotek ApS)
Agern Alle 24-26
2970 Hoersholm / DK
03 / LANGE, Jesper
(c/o MC2 Biotek ApS)
Agern Alle 24-26
2970 Hoersholm / DK
04 / GEORGIOU, Michelle
(c/o Drug Delivery
Solutions Limited)
Randalls Road
Leatherhead Surrey KT22 7RY / GB
05 / WHEELER, Derek
(c/o Drug Delivery
Solutions Limited)
Randalls Road
Leatherhead Surrey KT22 7RY / GB
06 / EVANS, David
(c/o Drug Delivery
Solutions Limited)
Randalls Road
Leatherhead Surrey KT22 7RY / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Budde Schou A/S
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17812796.516.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017DK50201
Priority number, dateDK2016007043817.06.2016         Original published format: DK 201670438
DK2017007022528.03.2017         Original published format: DK 201770225
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215723
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471720
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:XN21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4172, A61P17/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON URÄMISCHEM PRURITUS[2019/17]
English:FORMULATION FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF UREMIC PRURITUS[2019/17]
French:FORMULATION DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU PRURIT URÉMIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2015252035  (LIEDTKE WOLFGANG [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-4, 10-11 * Paragraphs [0044], [0083]; claim 15 * [A] 2, 5-9, 12-15;
 [A]WO2009103959  (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * Examples 1-4, 10; claims 1, 3; figs. 2A-D *;
 [A]US6573302  (HOLT STEPHEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Column 5, lines 1-3; claims 1-2 *