Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472607

EP3472607 - POLAR FLUID GATED FIELD EFFECT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
06.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Graphwear Technologies Inc.
953 Indiana Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / GUDIBANDE, Rajatesch, R.
953 Indiana Street
San Francisco CA 94107 / US
02 / RADHAKRISHNAN, Saurabh
953 Indiana Street
San Francisco CA 94107 / US
03 / GALAND, Antoine
953 Indiana Street
San Francisco CA 94107 / US
04 / VORA, Meet
953 Indiana Street
San Francisco CA 94107 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17812823.730.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IB01003
Priority number, dateUS201662356729P30.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662356729 P
US201662356742P30.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662356742 P
[2019/31]
Former [2019/17]US201662351942P18.06.2016
US201662356729P30.06.2016
US201662356742P30.06.2016
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017216641
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3472607
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/414, H01L29/16
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:DURCH POLARE FLÜSSIGKEITEN GESTEUERTE FELDEFFEKTVORRICHTUNGEN[2019/17]
English:POLAR FLUID GATED FIELD EFFECT DEVICES[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIFS À EFFET DE CHAMP DONT LA GRILLE EST CONSTITUÉE PAR UN FLUIDE POLAIRE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.06.2017Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
19.03.2019Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001
15.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2015054663  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 11-14, 23-27 * , para [0031], [0039], [0061], [0063], [0065]; Fig 2, 4A *;
 [Y]US2008035494  (GOMEZ ROMEL D R [US], et al) [Y] 11-14, 24, 26, 27 * para [0025], [0061], [0062], [0106], [0138], [0139], [0156], [0232]; Fig 2, 14 *;
 [AP]US2016252517  (LO YU-HWA [US], et al) [AP] 1-3, 11-14, 23-27 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2016178569  (HOFFMAN PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 11-14, 23-27 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2015307936  (GOLDSMITH BRETT [US]) [A] 1-3, 11-14, 23-27 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2007231211  (YOO KYU-TAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-3, 11-14, 23-27 * , entire document *;
 [Y]  - HE et al., "Solution-Gated Graphene Field Effect Transistors Integrated in Microfluidic Systems and Used for Flow Velocity Detection", Nano Lett., vol. 12, (20120210), pages 14 04 - 1409, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/abs/10.1021/nl2040805, XP055043754 [Y] 1-3, 11-14, 23-27

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl2040805
 [A]  - OHNO et al., "Electrolyte-Gated Graphene Field-Effect Transistors for Detecting pH and Protein ,Adsorption", Nano Lett., vol. 9, no. 9, (20090728), URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/10.1021/nl901596m, XP055043758 [A] 1-3, 11-14, 23-27

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl901596m