Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469041

EP3469041 - METHOD OF USING MELANIN TO FERTILIZE SOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solis Herrera, Arturo
Centro de Estudios de la Fotosintesis Humana S.C.
Lopez Velarde 108 y 109
Colonia Centro
20000 Aguascalientes / MX
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17812847.612.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB53472
Priority number, dateUS201662349323P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349323 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216707
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469041
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09K17/04, A01N59/00, C05D9/00, C05F11/08, C09K17/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON MELANIN ZUR BODENDÜNGUNG[2019/16]
English:METHOD OF USING MELANIN TO FERTILIZE SOIL[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE MÉLANINE POUR FERTILISER UN SOL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2005178057  (LAYZELL DAVID B [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [Y]WO2015170161  (SOLIS HERRERA ARTURO [MX]) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *