Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472050

EP3472050 - INLINE SCREW FEEDING VACUUM ARC THRUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technion Research & Development Foundation Limited
Senate House
Technion City
3200004 Haifa / IL
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KRONHAUS, Igal
17 Habroshim Street
3448337 Haifa / IL
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Modiano, Gabriella Diana , et al
Modiano & Partners (DE)
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17812893.015.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IL50670
Priority number, dateIL2016024625015.06.2016         Original published format: IL 24625016
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216802
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472050
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B64G1/40, F03H1/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBENZUFÜHRENDER INLINE-VAKUUMLICHTBOGENTHRUSTER[2019/17]
English:INLINE SCREW FEEDING VACUUM ARC THRUSTER[2019/17]
French:PROPULSEUR À ARC SOUS VIDE À ALIMENTATION PAR VIS EN LIGNE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011258981  (KEIDAR MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * whole *;
 [A]US6145298  (BURTON JR KENNETH E [US]) [A] 1-29 * whole *;
 [A]WO2014127325  (UNIV GEORGE WASHINGTON [US]) [A] 1-29 * whole *