Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473436

EP3473436 - LAMINATE METAL PLATE FOR METAL CONTAINER LID AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HIRAGUCHI, Tomonari
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE STEEL CORPORATION
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
02 / OSHIMA, Yasuhide
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE STEEL CORPORATION
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
03 / KOJIMA, Katsumi
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE STEEL CORPORATION
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813062.115.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP18141
Priority number, dateJP2016012033917.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016120339
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217159
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473436
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B32B15/09, B65D8/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:LAMINATMETALLPLATTE FÜR BEHÄLTERDECKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/17]
English:LAMINATE METAL PLATE FOR METAL CONTAINER LID AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2019/17]
French:PLAQUE MÉTALLIQUE STRATIFIÉE POUR COUVERCLE DE RÉCIPIENT MÉTALLIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018Translation filed 
03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Search fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2005254628  (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0029] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2004345232  (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1-3 * , paragraph [0014] & US 2007/0036995 A1 paragraphs [0021] to [0027] & WO 2004/103697 A1 & EP 1625934 A1 *;
 [A]JP2004122577  (MITSUBISHI ALUMINIUM) [A] 1-3 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0013] to [0020] (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2015125184  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * , entire text & US 2017/0008256 A1 & EP 3109178 A1 & CN 106029511 A & KR 10-2016-0124836 A *;
 [A]WO2015125185  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * , entire text & US 2016/0355294 A1 & EP 3109042 A1 & CN 106029368 A & KR 10-2016-0124196 A *