Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474200

EP3474200 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / OHASHI, Takeshi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / SHINODA, Masataka
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / WU, Jianing
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / ONUMA, Tomoya
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813072.016.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP18376
Priority number, dateJP2016011926715.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016119267
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217169
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474200
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/06, G06Q50/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, -VERFAHREN UND -PROGRAMM[2019/17]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase26.12.2018Translation filed 
10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
04.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008118080  (HELIOSPECTRA AKTIEBOLAG [SE], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 24, line 5; figure 1; claims 1-11 *
International search[YA]JP2007052548  (ZENKOKU NIKUGYU JIGYO KYODO KU) [Y] 1, 7-12, 15, 16 * , particularly, paragraphs [0009], [0014], [0038] to [0039], [0054] to [0057] (Family: none) * [A] 2-6, 13, 14;
 [YA]JPH078128  (NAT FEDERATION AGRIC COOP ASS, et al) [Y] 1, 7-12, 15, 16 * , particularly, paragraphs [0010] to [0016], [0035] (Family: none) * [A] 2-6, 13, 14;
 [YA]JP2008148569  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 11, 12 * , particularly, paragraphs [0006], [0009] & US 2008/0147458 A1 particularly, paragraphs [0008], [0020] * [A] 1-10, 13-16;
 [A]JP2015141467  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015173605  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *