Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470155

EP3470155 - DRILL BIT AND HOLE FORMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8324 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUYAMA, Yousuke
c/o YONEZAWA DIA ELECTRONICS Co. Inc.
446-3 Hachimanpara 3-chome
Yonezawa-shi Yamagata 992-1128 / JP
02 / OGASHIWA, Takaaki
c/o YONEZAWA DIA ELECTRONICS Co. Inc.
446-3 Hachimanpara 3-chome
Yonezawa-shi Yamagata 992-1128 / JP
03 / UMEHARA, Noritsugu
c/o National University Corporation
Nagoya University
1 Furo-cho
Chikusa-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP
04 / OYAMA, Shintarou
c/o National University Corporation
Nagoya University
1 Furo-cho
Chikusa-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813087.819.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP18905
Priority number, dateJP2016011723913.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016117239
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217184
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470155
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:B23B51/00, B23B35/00, B23B47/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BOHRMEISSEL UND LOCHFORMUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:DRILL BIT AND HOLE FORMATION METHOD[2019/16]
French:FORET ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE TROU[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2979832  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 8-15 * paragraphs [0059] , [0060] , [0183]; figures 1-3 *;
 [XYI]WO2016063893  (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 8-15 [I] 5-7;
 [XI]WO2016047803  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [I] 5-7;
 [XI]CA2960464  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0144]; figures 1-19 * [I] 5-7;
 [XI]US9144845  (GRZINA DONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 7, paragraphs 48-56; figures 10-13 * [I] 5-7
International search[YA]WO2014157570  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-4, 8-15 * , paragraphs [0036] to [0053] & US 2016/0045961 A1 paragraphs [0062] to [0083] & EP 2979832 A1 & CN 105073355 A & KR 10-2015-0133210 A * [A] 5-7;
 [Y]JP2009148865  (OMI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-3, 8-15 * , paragraphs [0003], [0012]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPH08511208  (Iscar Ltd.) [Y] 4 * , page 9, line 15 to page 11, line 17; fig. 1 to 2, 4 & US 5695303 A column 4, line 49 to column 6, line 5; fig. 1 to 2, 4 & EP 699119 A1 & CN 1124474 A *;
 [A]WO2016063893  (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0031]; fig. 2 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2001287110  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0008]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]EP2431565  (IRWIN IND TOOLS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0018]; fig. 1 & DE 102010045388 A1 *