Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474333

EP3474333 - SOLAR CELL AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND SOLAR CELL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaneka Corporation
3-18, Nakanoshima 2-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KONISHI Katsunori
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION
1-1, Torikainishi 5-Chome
Settsu-shi
Osaka 566-0072 / JP
02 / NAKANO Kunihiro
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION
1-1, Torikainishi 5-Chome
Settsu-shi
Osaka 566-0072 / JP
03 / KAWASAKI Hayato
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION
1-1, Torikainishi 5-Chome
Settsu-shi
Osaka 566-0072 / JP
04 / YOSHIKAWA Kunta
c/o KANEKA CORPORATION
1-1, Torikainishi 5-Chome
Settsu-shi
Osaka 566-0072 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813121.529.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP19851
Priority number, dateJP2016011930915.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016119309
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217219
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474333
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/0747, H01L31/0224
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SOLARZELLE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND SOLARZELLENMODUL[2019/17]
English:SOLAR CELL AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND SOLAR CELL MODULE[2019/17]
French:CELLULE SOLAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LADITE CELLULE, ET MODULE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2018Translation filed 
05.12.2018National basic fee paid 
05.12.2018Search fee paid 
05.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2015183761  (SUNPOWER CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0027] to [00102]; fig. 1 to 11 & US 2015/0349154 A1 & TW 201611310 A & AU 2015267265 A & KR 10-2017-0013324 A & CN 106415852 A & DE 112015002551 T & JP 2017-517146 A *;
 [A]WO2008050889  (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & JP 2009-152222 A & US 2009/0223562 A1 *;
 [A]US2015349155  (KIM TAESEOK [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010108994  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *