Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474538

EP3474538 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ONO, Jun
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / SHIBATA, Yasushi
c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
4-14-1 Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813141.301.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP20394
Priority number, dateJP2016011857615.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016118576
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217239
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474538
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/243, H04N1/40, H04N5/235, H04N5/355, H04N5/365
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2019/17]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, ET PROGRAMME[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US8836850  (KAIDA HIRONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 38 - column 8, line 64; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US8823825  (TATSUZAWA YUKIYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 18 - column 14, line 20; figures 1-15 *;
 [A]US2008284880  (NUMATA HAJIME [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,5,13 * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0194] *
International search[A]JP2014053823  (CANON KK) [A] 1-10 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0002], [0004], [0005], [0024], [0028], [0029], [0054] to [0074]; fig. 7 & US 2014/0071311 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0004], [0006], [0007], [0041], [0045], [0046] to [0091]; fig. 7 *;
 [A]JP2013070245  (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0016], [0017], [0057], [0132] & US 2013/0076953 A1 paragraphs [0030], [0031], [0072], [0147] & CN 103024304 A & KR 10-2013-0032234 A & TW 201315219 A *