Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474387

EP3474387 - PRESSURE CONTACT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alps Alpine Co., Ltd.
1-7, Yukigaya-otsukamachi
Ota-ku
Tokyo
145-8501 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MORI, Toshiharu
c/o ALPS ELECTRIC CO. LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya-otsukamachi
Ota-ku
Tokyo 145-8501 / JP
02 / YAMAZAKI, Keisuke
c/o ALPS ELECTRIC CO. LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya-otsukamachi
Ota-ku
Tokyo 145-8501 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813155.302.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP20573
Priority number, dateJP2016012089417.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016120894
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217253
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474387
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/24, H01R43/16
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:DRUCKKONTAKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/17]
English:PRESSURE CONTACT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2019/17]
French:CONTACT DE PRESSION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018Translation filed 
06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Search fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]JPH06203933  (IBM) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0020], [0032]; fig. 6 to 8 & EP 0592844 A2 & US 5297967 A column 5, lines 4 to 26; column 8, lines 1 to 25; fig. 6 to 8 * [Y] 4-6 [A] 2-3, 7;
 [Y]WO2010055872  (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 4-6 * , paragraphs [0117] to [0118]; fig. 18 to 20 & JP 2012-021773 A *;
 [A]JP2016001583  (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1, 7 * , paragraphs [0048] to [0051], [0076]; fig. 1 to 5 & CN 105098432 A & EP 2947721 A2 & KR 10-2015-0135124 A & US 2015/0340789 A1 paragraphs [0067] to [0071], [0095] to [0096]; fig. 1 to 5 *;
 [A]JP2005129428  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0016]; fig. 1, 6(b) & CN 1611950 A & KR 10-2005-0040102 A & TW 200525153 A & US 2005/0088193 A1 paragraphs [0025] to [0028]; fig. 1, 6(b) *