Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474113

EP3474113 - ELECTRIC LEVER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMIZU, Hiroaki
c/o Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
02 / KIDA, Yasuake
c/o Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
03 / HIRATA, Yousuke
c/o Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date17813219.708.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP21387
Priority number, dateJP2016011847915.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016118479
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217322
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474113
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G05G1/015
[2019/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE HEBELVORRICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:ELECTRIC LEVER DEVICE[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LEVIER ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2018Translation filed 
26.11.2018National basic fee paid 
26.11.2018Search fee paid 
26.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]JP2009268682  (RYUSYO INDUSTRIAL CO) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0048]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [A] 2;
 [Y]JPH0713890U  (Komatsu MEC Corp.) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0009]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPS48102272  (Mitsubishi Electric Corp.) [Y] 5-6 * , page 2, upper right column, line 1 to lower right column, line 18; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007115826  (NINTENDO CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0005], [0027] to [0055], [0083] to [0086]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH03230209  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-6 * , specification, page 3, upper left column, line 12 to page 4, upper left column, line 3; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPS5226972U  (Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-6 * , specification, page 2, line 1 to page 4, line 7; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPS6326935U  (Ohi Seisakusho Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-6 * , specification, page 4, line 18 to page 9, the last line; fig. 1 to 6 & US 4778953 A column 2, line 47 to column 6, line 19; fig. 1 to 6 *