Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473610

EP3473610 - METHOD OF PRODUCING C2 C20 FLUORINE-CONTAINING ORGANIC ACID, AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING C2 C20 FLUORINE-CONTAINING ORGANIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ITATANI, Shuuji
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP
02 / OHASHI, Mihoko
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813230.409.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP21478
Priority number, dateJP2016011980716.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016119807
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217333
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473610
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07C51/48, C07C59/315
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER C2-C20-FLUOR-HALTIGEN ORGANISCHEN SÄURE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT C2-C20-FLUOR-HALTIGER ORGANISCHER SÄURE[2019/17]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING C2 C20 FLUORINE-CONTAINING ORGANIC ACID, AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING C2 C20 FLUORINE-CONTAINING ORGANIC ACID[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN FLUOR C2 C20 CONTENANT UN ACIDE ORGANIQUE, ET D'UNE COMPOSITION CONTENANT UN FLUOR C2 C20 CONTENANT UN ACIDE ORGANIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019Translation filed 
10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2007099624  (YUNIMATEKKU KK) [X] 1-11 * , claims; example 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2004506708  (E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co.) [A] 1-11 * , claims; examples & US 6281374 B1 & US 2002/0087016 A1 & WO 2002/016302 A1 *;
 [A]JPH0625072  (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-11 * , claims; examples & US 5312935 A & EP 566974 A1 *;
 [A]JPS62198640  (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-11 * , claims; examples & US 4751027 A & EP 234013 A1 *;
 [A]  - HUANG, BING-NAN et al., "A new method for the preparation of perfluorocarboxylic acids", Journal of Fluorine Chemistry, (19870000), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 49 - 62, XP055450622 [A] 1-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(00)82053-9