Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473238

EP3473238 - POWDER HAIR DYE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hoyu Co., Ltd.
501 Tokugawa 1-chome
Higashi-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8650 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / FUTATSUGI Shizuka
c/o HOYU CO. LTD.
GENERAL RESEARCH&DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE
1-12 Roboku
Nagakute-shi Aichi 480-1136 / JP
02 / UESAWA Yoshiyuki
c/o HOYU CO. LTD.
GENERAL RESEARCH&DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE
1-12 Roboku
Nagakute-shi Aichi 480-1136 / JP
03 / MATSUBAYASHI Jun
c/o HOYU CO. LTD.
GENERAL RESEARCH&DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE
1-12 Roboku
Nagakute-shi Aichi 480-1136 / JP
04 / UMINO Hiromi
c/o HOYU CO. LTD.
GENERAL RESEARCH&DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE
1-12 Roboku
Nagakute-shi Aichi 480-1136 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813235.309.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP21519
Priority number, dateJP2016011925515.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016119255
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217338
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473238
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/73, A61K8/02, A61K8/22, A61K8/34, A61K8/41, A61Q5/06, A61Q5/10
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:HAARFÄRBEPULVERZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2019/17]
English:POWDER HAIR DYE COMPOSITION[2019/17]
French:COMPOSITION DE COLORANT CAPILLAIRE EN POUDRE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018Translation filed 
10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Search fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2011093823  (HOYU KK) [Y] 1-6 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0001], [0019] to [0021], [0024], [0040], [0065] to [0067], [0069], [0073], [0081] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2010260837  (HOYU KK) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0015], [0017] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2011105620  (HOYU KK) [A] 1-6 * , claim 1; paragraph [0220] & US 2012/0207689 A1 claim 1; paragraph [0277] & WO 2011/059027 A1 & EP 2500010 A1 *;
 [A]JP2006273759  (HOYU KK) [A] 1-6 * , claim 1; paragraph [0047] (Family: none) *