Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3473238 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3473238



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 136
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
03.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
10.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.12.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
10.12.2018 Description Search / examination 43
10.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 29