Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470754

EP3470754 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba Carrier Corporation
72-34, Horikawa-cho
Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-8585 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMODA, Kazuma
c/o Toshiba Carrier Corporation
336 Tadehara
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 416-8521 / JP
02 / MORITA, Takeru
c/o Toshiba Carrier Corporation
336 Tadehara
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 416-8521 / JP
03 / IKEDA, Shingo
c/o Toshiba Carrier Corporation
336 Tadehara
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 416-8521 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Straße 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813279.112.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP21705
Priority number, dateJP2016011813214.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016118132
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217383
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470754
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F25B47/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF À CYCLE DE RÉFRIGÉRATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018Translation filed 
12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Search fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]WO2013151005  (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP [JP]) [Y] 1, 6 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0026], [0045], [0060] to [0063]; fig. 1, 3 & CN 104204693 A * [A] 2-5;
 [YA]WO2011013672  (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3, 6 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0038], [0080] to [0086], [0098] to [0103]; fig. 1, 6, 7 & US 2012/0125033 A1 paragraphs [0023] to [0049], [0098] to [0104], [0118] to [0123]; fig. 1, 6, 7 & EP 2461111 A1 & KR 10-2012-0031227 A & CN 103822394 A * [A] 4-5;
 [Y]JPS58205058  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-3, 6 * , page 2, upper left column, line 6 to lower left column, line 8; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2014020568  (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [Y] 1-3, 6 * , paragraph [0068] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPH06235554  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [Y] 3 * , paragraph [0015] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2015081693  (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [Y] 3 * , paragraph [0027] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012067983  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0012] (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2013104576  (LEE JAEWAN [KR]) [A] 1-6 * , abstract & EP 2589896 A2 & KR 10-1319687 B1 *