Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473215

EP3473215 - STEAM HOT TOOL AND METHOD FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku
Tokyo 103-8210 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / TSUCHIYA Shigemi
c/o Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
1-3 Bunka 2-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 131-8501 / JP
02 / SAITA Yasuto
c/o Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
1-3 Bunka 2-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 131-8501 / JP
03 / ODA Hideshi
c/o Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
1-3 Bunka 2-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 131-8501 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813297.313.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP21782
Priority number, dateJP2016012086417.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016120864
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217401
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473215
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F7/03, A61F7/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:HEISSDAMPFINSTRUMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/17]
English:STEAM HOT TOOL AND METHOD FOR USING SAME[2019/17]
French:OUTIL CHAUD À VAPEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019Translation filed 
10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2011136060  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0016], [0025] to [0028], [0040] to [0042], [0065]; fig. 1, 8 to 10 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2006102145  (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings & CN 1757341 A & TW 200624137 A *;
 [A]JP2011188947  (KAO CORP) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *