Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470243

EP3470243 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HIRAISHI Tomohiro
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17813321.113.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP21861
Priority number, dateJP2016011722913.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016117229
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217425
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470243
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/11, B60C11/03, B60C11/12, B60C11/13
[2019/21]
Former International [2019/16]B60C11/11, B60C11/03, B60C11/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2019/16]
English:TIRE[2019/16]
French:PNEUMATIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018Translation filed 
12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Search fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
19.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2977230  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5,7-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0021] , [0022] , [0025] , [0029] - [0031]; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP2781374  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1-5,7-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0063] - [0070] - [0072]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]JP2015147545  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 1-12 * figure -; claim - *
International search[YA]WO2014148260  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5, 7-12 * , claims; paragraphs [0006], [0018] to [0019], [0022]; drawings & US 2016/0009143 A1 claims; paragraphs [0006], [0031] to [0032], [0035]; figures & EP 2977230 A1 & CN 105142932 A * [A] 6;
 [Y]WO2015016005  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1-5, 7-12 * , paragraphs [0059] to [0063]; fig. 2, 4 & US 2016/0167443 A1 paragraphs [0057] to [0067]; fig. 2, 4 & EP 3028878 A1 & CN 105377588 A *;
 [A]WO2015052966  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * , claims; drawings & US 2016/0236519 A1 claims; figures & EP 3056355 A1 & CN 105705344 A *;
 [A]WO2004011282  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * , claims; drawings & US 2006/0108039 A1 claims; figures & EP 1547820 A1 & CN 1671565 A *;
 [A]WO02102611  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * , claims; drawings & US 2005/0072505 A1 claims; figures & EP 1386758 A1 & CN 1462244 A *