Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474296

EP3474296 - OXIDE SUPERCONDUCTING WIRE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujikura Ltd.
5-1, Kiba 1-chome
Koto-ku
Tokyo 135-8512 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / IGARASHI, Mitsunori
c/o Fujikura Ltd.
Sakura Works
1440 Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813382.315.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP22106
Priority number, dateJP2016011983816.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016119838
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217487
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474296
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01B12/06, C01G1/00, H01B13/00, H01F6/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SUPRALEITENDER OXIDDRAHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/17]
English:OXIDE SUPERCONDUCTING WIRE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2019/17]
French:FIL SUPRACONDUCTEUR D'OXYDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018Translation filed 
18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2008130291  (CENTRAL RES INST ELECT, et al) [X] 1-4 * , claims (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2012033402  (UNIV KYUSHU, et al) [X] 1-4 * , claims & US 2012/0028808 A1 claims *;
 [A]JP2013073728  (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-4 * , fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *