Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473886

EP3473886 - SLIDING MEMBER FOR VEHICULAR SUSPENSION, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SLIDING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RC-Logo Co., Ltd.
389-10 Tateno-cho
Minami-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-0827 / JP
For all designated states
Showa Corporation
14-1 Fujiwara-cho 1-chome
Gyoda-shi, Saitama 361-8506 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ITO Kimio
c/o RC-LOGO CO. LTD.
389-10 Tateno-cho
Minami-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-0827 / JP
02 / AWASA Shigeki
c/o SHOWA CORPORATION
Asaba Plant
2601 Matsubara
Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka 437-1194 / JP
03 / YAMAMOTO Kohei
c/o SHOWA CORPORATION
Asaba Plant
2601 Matsubara
Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka 437-1194 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813400.315.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP22184
Priority number, dateJP2016012046817.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016120468
JP2017008773326.04.2017         Original published format: JP 2017087733
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217506
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473886
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16F9/32, C23C14/08, C23C14/32
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:GLEITELEMENT FÜR FAHRZEUGAUFHÄNGUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GLEITELEMENTS[2019/17]
English:SLIDING MEMBER FOR VEHICULAR SUSPENSION, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SLIDING MEMBER[2019/17]
French:ÉLÉMENT COULISSANT POUR SUSPENSION DE VÉHICULE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT COULISSANT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018Translation filed 
06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Search fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH0821469  (ITO KOZAI KAKO CENTER KK) [A] 1-4 * , claims 1 to 2; paragraphs [0012] to [0016] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH07207446  (NIIGATA ENGINEERING CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0025] to [0028] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2005282589  (SHOWA CORP) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0030] to [0041] (Family: none) *