Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473449

EP3473449 - INK-JET RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8210 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KURODA, Azusa
c/o Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
1334 Minato
Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
02 / MATSUMOTO, Yuta
c/o Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
1334 Minato
Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813433.416.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP22357
Priority number, dateJP2016012126817.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016121268
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217540
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473449
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/00, B41J2/01, C09D11/30
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/17]
English:INK-JET RECORDING METHOD[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2018Translation filed 
13.12.2018National basic fee paid 
13.12.2018Search fee paid 
13.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2010064478  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [X] 1-11, 13-15 * , claims; paragraphs [0021], [0023], [0051] to [0053]; examples 1 to 2; fig. 2 to 3 (Family: none) * [Y] 12;
 [Y]JP2004034441  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [Y] 12 * , claims; paragraphs [0109] to [0110], [0119] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010221670  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2009166387  (RICOH KK) [A] 1 * , & US 2010/0295891 A1 & WO 2009/091079 A1 & CN 101909898 A *;
 [A]JP2007230021  (RICOH KK) [A] 1 * , & US 2007/0197685 A1 & EP 1811002 A2 *