Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470931

EP3470931 - PROCESS CARTRIDGE AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MURAKAMI, Ryuta
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / HORIKAWA, Tadashi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / URATANI, Shunsuke
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
04 / INABA, Yuichiro
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813450.814.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP22763
Priority number, dateJP2016011818114.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016118181
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217557
Date:21.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470931
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03G21/18
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBA14.01.2019
ME14.01.2019
Validation statesMA14.01.2019
MD14.01.2019
TitleGerman:PROZESSKARTUSCHE UND ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:PROCESS CARTRIDGE AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE[2019/16]
French:CARTOUCHE DE TRAITEMENT ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018Translation filed 
14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2005114159  (RICOH KK) [A] 1-180 * , paragraphs [0055] to [0064]; fig. 13 & US 2005/0111882 A1 paragraphs [0098] to [0107]; fig. 13 *;
 [A]JP2002328499  (SHARP KK) [A] 1-180 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0047]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2005214233  (SHARP KK) [A] 1-180 * , abstract & US 2005/0163535 A1 abstract & CN 1648489 A *;
 [A]JP2009175667  (RICOH KK) [A] 1-180 * , paragraphs [0039], [0040]; fig. 7 & US 2009/0169259 A1 paragraphs [0063] to [0067]; fig. 7 *;
 [A]JP2000267374  (MINOLTA CO LTD) [A] 1-180 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0035]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007086665  (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1-180 * , paragraphs [0043] to [0072]; fig. 4 to 8 & US 2007/0147883 A1 paragraphs [0057] to [0088]; fig. 4 to 8 *;
 [A]JP2013545134  (Zhuhai Seine Technology Ltd.) [A] 1-180 * , entire text & US 2013/0216265 A1 entire text & WO 2012/055312 A1 & EP 2634636 A1 & CN 102466997 A & CN 102866608 A & CN 102866609 A & CN 202677063 U & CN 202710924 U & CN 103226305 A & RU 2013113999 A & AR 99246 A *;
 [A]JP2007178606  (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 49-133, 150-175 * , paragraph [0044]; fig. 7 & US 2007/0147895 A1 paragraph [0068]; fig. 7 *;
 [A]JPH10104997  (CANON KK) [A] 1-180 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2009203494  (KOIZUMI SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 1-180 * , paragraph [0043]; fig. 2, 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2000347487  (CANON KK) [A] 1-180 * , paragraphs [0026], [0027]; fig. 6 & US 6301457 B1 column 6, lines 12 to 47; fig. 6 & EP 1059571 A2 & DE 60020452 D & DE 60020452 T & KR 10-2001-0020956 A & CN 1276543 A *;
 [A]JP2009151207  (RICOH KK) [A] 49-133, 150-175 * , entire text (Family: none) *