Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474421

EP3474421 - MOTOR CONNECTOR AND MOTOR HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98 Huam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hae Seok
98 Huam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813490.418.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017KR05156
Priority number, dateKR2016007425015.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160074250
[2019/17]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217665
Date:21.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474421
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02K5/22, H02K5/10, H02K11/20, H02K7/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:MOTORVERBINDER UND MOTOR DAMIT[2019/17]
English:MOTOR CONNECTOR AND MOTOR HAVING SAME[2019/17]
French:CONNECTEUR DE MOTEUR ET MOTEUR COMPORTANT LE CONNECTEUR DE MOTEUR[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018Translation filed 
11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Search fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH10285878  (KUSATSU ELECTRIC) [Y] 1-13 * See paragraphs [1]-[3], [6]-[10] and figures 1-5. *;
 [Y]JP2013207141  (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-13 * See paragraphs [1]-[3], [26]-[54] and figures 1A-9. *;
 [A]KR20110048968  (NEW MOTECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]KR20110078262  (KEYANG ELECTRIC MACHINERY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]JP2014091220  (APIC YAMADA CORP) [A] 1-13 * See the entire document. *