Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471399

EP3471399 - NIGHT VISION DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Kwanhyung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / KIM, Hyunjoon
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / OH, Sangguel
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
04 / LEE, Dongryeol
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
05 / JI, Salkmann
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
06 / HONG, Samnyol
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Schornack, Oliver
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813569.513.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR06157
Priority number, dateUS201662349134P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349134 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217745
Date:21.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471399
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/355, H04N5/225, H04N5/232
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:NACHTSICHTANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:NIGHT VISION DISPLAY DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE DE VISION NOCTURNE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019Translation filed 
03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Search fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1376154  (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0010], [0016], [0027], [0030]-[0050]; and figures 1,4. *;
 [Y]KR100778904B  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD.) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0007], [0009], [0042]. *;
 [Y]US2015144790  (VELICHKO SERGEY [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0025]; and figure 2. *;
 [A]KR20150086901  (PALMVISION CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0027]; claims 1-4; and figure 1. *;
 [A]KR20160061132  (ITS ENGINEERING CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0059]-[0080]; claim 1; and figure 2. *