Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470548

EP3470548 - SOLUTION COMPOSITION FOR STEEL SHEET SURFACE TREATMENT, ZINC-BASED PLATED STEEL SHEET SURFACE-TREATED WITH SAME, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Posco
(Goedong-dong)
6261 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR
For all designated states
Noroo Coil Coatings Co., Ltd.
54 Jangheung-ro 39-gil
Nam-gu
Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37871 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CHO, Soo-Hyoun
c/o Pohang Iron&Steel Works
6262 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37877 / KR
02 / BAE, Dae-Chul
103-1704,95, Dangsan-ro,
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07264 / KR
03 / KIM, Dong-Yun
(Bakdal-dong)
351 Bakdal-ro
Manan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 13977 / KR
04 / PARK, Chang-Hyun
104
(I-dong)
4-11 Samtaegi 2-gil
Sangnok-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15496 / KR
 [2019/33]
Former [2019/22]01 / CHO, Soo-Hyoun
c/o Pohang Iron&Steel Works
6262 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37877 / KR
02 / BAE, Dae-Chul
103-304,95, Dangsan-ro,
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07264 / KR
03 / KIM, Dong-Yun
(Bakdal-dong)
351 Bakdal-ro
Manan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 13977 / KR
04 / PARK, Chang-Hyun
104
(I-dong)
4-11 Samtaegi 2-gil
Sangnok-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15496 / KR
Former [2019/16]01 / CHO, Soo-Hyoun
c/o Pohang Iron&Steel Works
6262 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37877 / KR
02 / BAE, Dae-Chul
c/o Pohang Iron&Steel Works
6262 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37877 / KR
03 / KIM, Dong-Yun
(Bakdal-dong)
351 Bakdal-ro
Manan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 13977 / KR
04 / PARK, Chang-Hyun
104
(I-dong)
4-11 Samtaegi 2-gil
Sangnok-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15496 / KR
Representative(s)Zech, Stefan Markus
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813574.514.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR06168
Priority number, dateKR2016007375214.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160073752
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217750
Date:21.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470548
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:C23C22/05, C23C2/26, C23C2/06, C23C2/40, C09D5/08, C09D5/10, C22C18/00, C22C18/04, C23C22/40, C23C22/44, C23C22/42
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/16]C23C22/05, C23C2/26, C23C2/06, C23C2/40, C09D5/08, C09D5/10, C22C18/00, C22C18/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:LÖSUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STAHLBLECHOBERFLÄCHEN, DAMIT OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTES ZINKPLATTIERTES STAHLBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:SOLUTION COMPOSITION FOR STEEL SHEET SURFACE TREATMENT, ZINC-BASED PLATED STEEL SHEET SURFACE-TREATED WITH SAME, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITION EN SOLUTION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE D'UNE TÔLE D'ACIER, TÔLE D'ACIER PLAQUÉE À BASE DE ZINC TRAITÉE EN SURFACE AVEC LADITE COMPOSITION, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019Translation filed 
14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1992718  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 10 - page 6, paragraph 24 * * page 6, paragraph 25 * * page 7, paragraph 27 * * page 8; examples 4, 12; table 1 *;
 [A]EP2540865  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, paragraphs 27-29 * * page 7, paragraph 33 - page 8, paragraph 37 * * page 12, paragraph 65 - page 15, paragraph 77 * * page 16, paragraph 80; examples B1, B2, B3; table 2 * * page 16, paragraph 81; example C1 to C5; table 3 * * page 17, paragraph 83; example E1 to E4; table 5 * * page 17, paragraph 84; examples F1-F3; table 6 * * page 17, paragraph 86; table 8 * * page 18; examples 2-3; tables 9-1 *;
 [A]US2015225856  (ROTH MARCEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraphs 41, 43-44 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - page 5; example 3; table 1 * * page 5, paragraphs 49-50 * * page 7, paragraph 57 * * page 9, paragraphs 71-72 * * claims 1-33 *
International search[A]KR20150075001  (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-30 * See paragraph [0026] and claims 1, 4, 5, 7, 9. *;
 [A]KR20150073023  (POSCO [KR], et al) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0080]-[0084] and claims 1-10. *;
 [A]KR20150035343  (FONTAINE HOLDINGS NV.) [A] 1-30 * See paragraph [0089] and claim 1. *;
 [A]JPH0754156  (NIHON PARKERIZING) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0011] and claim 1. *;
 [A]US5366567  (OGINO TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * See abstract and column 6, lines 3-25. *