Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473129

EP3473129 - MULTILAYER SHEET COMPRISING FABRIC AND RESIN, TRAVEL BAG CASE MADE THEREFEROM, AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carimax Corporation
Gumi-dong
7 Migeum-ro 34beon-gil
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13626 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KWON, Hyung Joo
228-25 Jeosuji-gil
Docheok-myeon
Gwangju-si, Gyeonggi-do 12814 / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Crippa, Paolo Ernesto
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813606.515.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017KR06243
Priority number, dateKR2016007503716.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160075037
KR2016016285801.12.2016         Original published format: KR 20160162858
[2019/17]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217783
Date:21.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473129
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A45C5/02, A45C5/04, A45C5/03, B29C70/34, B29C70/50, B29C70/54, B29C70/06, B29C70/68, B29K105/08, B29L31/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGE FOLIE MIT GEWEBE UND HARZ, REISETASCHE DARAUS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/17]
English:MULTILAYER SHEET COMPRISING FABRIC AND RESIN, TRAVEL BAG CASE MADE THEREFEROM, AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2019/17]
French:FEUILLE MULTICOUCHE COMPRENANT UN TISSU ET UNE RÉSINE, BOÎTIER DE SAC DE VOYAGE FABRIQUÉ À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI ET APPAREIL POUR SA FABRICATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2018Translation filed 
26.11.2018National basic fee paid 
26.11.2018Search fee paid 
26.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]TWM522610U  (CHEN JIAN-ZHI [TW]) [Y] 1-10 * See claims !, 2; paragraphs [0008]-[0010]; and figures 1-3. * [A] 11;
 [Y]JP2002535178  (ATO FINDLEY, INC.) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1, 10, 11, 16; paragraphs [0008], [0011], [0023]; and figures 1, 2. *;
 [A]JP2004024433  (IRIS OHYAMA INC) [A] 1-11 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]KR20140064702  (SAMSONITE IP HOLDINGS SARL [LU]) [A] 1-11 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US4587175  (AKAO MUTSUO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * See the entire document. *;
 [PX]KR101691178B  (CARIMAX CORP [KR]) [PX] 1-11 * See the entire document. [*The above document is a registered patent of the priority application for the present PCT application.] *