Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474478

EP3474478 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING WIRELESS SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Suckchel
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / KO, Hyunsoo
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / KIM, Eunsun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813620.615.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017KR06284
Priority number, dateUS201662350204P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350204 P
US201662372327P09.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662372327 P
US201662382772P01.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662382772 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217797
Date:21.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474478
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04W72/12
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN EINES DRAHTLOSSIGNALS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2019/17]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING WIRELESS SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION D'UN SIGNAL SANS FIL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019Translation filed 
14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2016064049  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [227]-[299]; and figures 15-18. *;
 [A]WO2016040290  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0104]-[0159]; and figures 4, 5. *;
 [A]US2015351093  (AU KELVIN KAR KIN [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0035], [0036]; and figures 9-11. *
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "Short TTI Operation with Carrier Aggregation", R1-163324, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #84bis., Busan, (20160401), XP051079814 [A] 1-12 * See section 2.1. *
 [A]  - HUAWEI et al., "Discussion on UL Scheduling Timing for short TTI", R1-164064, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #85, Nanjing, China, (20160514), XP051096620 [A] 1-12 * See section 2. *