Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468358

EP3468358 - FISH POT BAIT AND METHOD FOR FISH POT FISHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kvalvikbait AS
Sykehusveien 21
9019 Tromsö / NO
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KVALVIK, Svein
Bevervegen 12
9017 Tromsö / NO
02 / MARTINSEN, Gustav
Dukveien 4
9105 Tromsö / NO
03 / SIIKAVUOPIO, Sten Ivar
Utsikten 289
9018 Tromsö / NO
04 / STORMO, Svein Kristian
Utsikten 290
9018 Tromsö / NO
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Curo AS
Vestre Rosten 81
7075 Tiller / NO
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813661.012.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017NO50154
Priority number, dateNO2016000099713.06.2016         Original published format: NO 20160997
[2019/16]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217861
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468358
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:XN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01K97/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:FISCHTOPFKÖDER UND VERFAHREN ZUM FISCHTOPFFISCHEN[2019/16]
English:FISH POT BAIT AND METHOD FOR FISH POT FISHING[2019/16]
French:APPÂT POUR POISSON POUR PÊCHE AU CASIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE PÊCHE DE POISSON AU CASIER[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Search fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DXY]US2011104325  (OLSSON CHARLES [US]) [DX] 1-7, 9-11 * Paragraph [0012], [0024], [0028], [0036], [0055], and claims 5-7, 9-10, 14, 17 * [Y] 8;
 [Y]WO2016010437  (POLYBAIT AS [NO]) [Y] 8 * Page 1 lines 20-23; claim 13 *;
 [Y]US2006008445  (GARRALDA VICENTE E [ES], et al) [Y] 8 * Claim 18 *;
 [Y]EP0137748  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 8 * Abstract and claims *;
 [DA]US6555144  (BEATTIE MICHAEL [CA], et al) [DA] 1-11 * Whole document *;
 [A]US2015359226  (BRADY TERRY E [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * Whole document *;
 [A]EP2753413  (FELS WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * Claims *