blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3468358
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019223423Global Dossier 25.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
NO20160997 13.06.2016
WO2017NO50154 12.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3027159Global Dossier 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
NO20160997 13.06.2016
WO2017NO50154 12.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3468358Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
NO20160997 13.06.2016
WO2017NO50154 12.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017217861Global Dossier 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
NO20160997 13.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO20160997 16.10.2017A1
NO341329B 16.10.2017B1
Priority number Date
NO20160997 13.06.2016