Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472812

EP3472812 - A MONITORING SYSTEM FOR SECURITY TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Irisity AB (PUBL)
Lindholmspiren 7
417 56 Göteborg / SE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BERLIC, Johnny
Vattenlinjen 1
417 64 Göteborg / SE
02 / HAGELBÄCK, Victor
Nederstevägen 17
SE-449 30 Nödinge / SE
 [2019/19]
Former [2019/17]01 / BERLIC, Johnny
Styrfarten 17
SE-417 65 Göteborg / SE
02 / HAGELBÄCK, Victor
Nederstevägen 17
SE-449 30 Nödinge / SE
Representative(s)Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 2096
403 12 Göteborg / SE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813685.924.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017SE50563
Priority number, dateSE2016005086117.06.2016         Original published format: SE 1650861
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217906
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472812
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/196
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SICHERHEITSTECHNOLOGIE[2019/17]
English:A MONITORING SYSTEM FOR SECURITY TECHNOLOGY[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE POUR TECHNOLOGIE DE SÉCURITÉ[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2018National basic fee paid 
29.11.2018Search fee paid 
29.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
29.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2013050502  (HIROO SAITO (JP), TOSHIO SATO (JP), OSAMU YAMAGUCHI (JP), HIROSHI SUKE) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract; [0039],[0041],[0045]-[0046],[0053],[0114],[0169],[0196],[0215] *;
 [A]EP2698740  (GE AVIATION SYATEMS LLC GRAND RAPIDS, MI 49512-1991 (US) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract; [0019],[0028] *;
 [A]US2010014717  (ROSENKRANTZ JOSEPH ETHAN [US) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract; [0057]-[0059], [0062] *;
 [A]US2005002561  (MONACHINO CHERYL A [US]; PARADIS ROSEMARY D [US) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract; [0036] *;
 [A]US2005034057  (HULL JONATHAN J [US]; EROL BERNA [US]; HART PETER E [US) [A] 1-16 * ; abstract; claim 27 *