Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473005

EP3473005 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENCODING VIDEO CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIVX, LLC
4350 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 950
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]For all designated states
DivX, LLC
4350 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 950
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AMIDEI, William, David
PO Box 928365
San Diego CA 92192 / US
02 / SHIVADAS, Abhishek
11341 Legacy Canyon Place
San Diego CA 92131 / US
03 / WU, Kevin, Dean-Yong
8148 Genesee Avenue 72
San Diego CA 92122 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Biberstraße 22
Postfach 36
1010 Wien / AT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813738.604.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US31114
Priority number, dateUS20161518356215.06.2016         Original published format: US201615183562
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218095
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473005
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/119, H04N19/177, H04N19/436, H04N21/2343, H04N21/845
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG VON VIDEOINHALTEN[2019/17]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENCODING VIDEO CONTENT[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ENCODAGE DE CONTENU VIDÉO[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2018National basic fee paid 
12.11.2018Search fee paid 
12.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US9197944  (REISNER SAMUEL J [US]) [X] 1, 9 * entire document * [Y] 2-8, 10-16;
 [Y]US2016134881  (WANG QI [CN], et al) [Y] 2-8, 10-16 * entire documentI *;
 [Y]US2013058393  (SOROUSHIAN KOUROSH [US]) [Y] 3-5, 11-13 * entire document *;
 [A]US2014241421  (ORTON-JAY SAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document *