Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472708

EP3472708 - SHARED ERROR DETECTION AND CORRECTION MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 South Federal Way
Boise, ID 83716 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIBATA, Tomoyuki
c/o Micron Memory Japan. Inc.
2-1 Yaesu 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0028 / JP
02 / KONDO, Chikara
c/o Micron Memory Japan, Inc.
2-1 Yaesu 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0028 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Hiroyuki
c/o Micron Memory Japan, Inc.
2-1 Yaesu 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0028 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Small, Gary James
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17813792.305.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US35946
Priority number, dateUS20161518365415.06.2016         Original published format: US201615183654
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218227
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472708
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/20
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:GETEILTER FEHLERERKENNUNGS- UND KORREKTURSPEICHER[2019/17]
English:SHARED ERROR DETECTION AND CORRECTION MEMORY[2019/17]
French:MÉMOIRE DE DÉTECTION ET DE CORRECTION D'ERREURS PARTAGÉE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
06.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6801471  (VIEHMANN HANS [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 7, 9-19, 22 * See column 2, lines 4-10; column 3, lines 54-58; column 4, lines 42-45; column 9, lines 46-67; claim 26; and figures 1 and 6. * [Y] 5-6, 8, 20-21;
 [Y]US2008117696  (CHANG CHUAN-JEN [TW], et al) [Y] 5-6, 20-21 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0018] and figure 1. *;
 [Y]US8924903  (IDE AKIRA [JP]) [Y] 8 * See column 3, lines 1-15; claims 5-6; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2014337573  (CHAI CHIAMING [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0032] and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]US2008141067  (NAUTIYAL VIVEK [IN]) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0041] and figure 1. *