Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468833

EP3468833 - SEAT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
17.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
17.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAECO Americas, LLC
623 Radar Road
Greensboro NC 27410 / US
[2019/48]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
HAECO Americas, Inc.
623 Radar Road
Greensboro NC 27410 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RIFE, Mitchell, R.
623 Radar Road
Greensboro, NC 27410 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813800.406.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36143
Priority number, dateUS201662349684P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349684 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218240
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468833
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/20, B60N2/22, B60N2/23, B60N2/68, B60N2/42, B60N2/427, B64D11/06
[2020/08]
Former International [2019/16]B60N2/20, B60N2/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SITZSYSTEM[2019/16]
English:SEAT SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE SIÈGE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
04.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2009091300  (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,8,25-27 * abstract * * page 1, line 11 - line 19 * * page 5, line 20 - line 25 * * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 30 * * page 16, line 15 - page 18, line 14 * * page 19, line 4 - line 22 * [A] 4-7,9-24 [I] 2;
 [A]EP2706010  (RECARO AIRCRAFT SEATING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0014] *;
 [A]US5320308  (BILEZIKJIAN VAHE [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * column 3, line 29 - column 6, line 11 *
International search[XYA]US4394047  (BRUNELLE RENE J) [X] 1, 7, 12-14 * , entire document, especially Fig 1-2, 4 -5; col 2, In 26-29, 45-68; col 3, In 1-6, 10-14, 18-39, 52-30; col 4, In 3-8 * [Y] 2-6, 8-11, 37-48 [A] 15-36, 49-70;
 [YA]US6478256  (WILLIAMSON JOHN [US]) [Y] 2-4, 37-48 * , entire document, especially Fig 1, 17-19; col 6, In 11-14; col 10, In 57-61; col 11, In 2-15 * [A] 15-36, 49-70;
 [Y]US2012139303  (WESTERINK RIK [US], et al) [Y] 5-6, 40-41 * , entire document, especially Fig 2; para [0013] *;
 [Y]US2004007910  (SKELLY TREVOR B [US]) [Y] 8-9, 43-44 * , entire document, especially Fig 2; para [0029]-[0030], [0034] *;
 [Y]US2016001886  (FULLERTON PAM [CA]) [Y] 10-11, 45-46 * , entire document, especially Fig 1, 3; para [0001], [0006]-[0007], [0016], [0019], [0020]-[0021]; claims 1, 13, 19 *;
 [A]US2013049416  (FUNKE MATTHIAS [US], et al) [A] 15-36, 49-70 * , entire document, especially Fig 1-4; para [0032]-[0035], [0041] *;
 [A]US5540483  (MARECHAL ROBERT R [FR]) [A] 1-70 * , entire document *;
 [A]US5320308  (BILEZIKJIAN VAHE [US], et al) [A] 1-70 * , entire document *;
 [A]US4511178  (BRENNAN EDWARD J [US]) [A] 1-70 * , entire document *