Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468456

EP3468456 - NEUROSTIMULATOR WITH TITRATION ASSIST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
24.01.2020Change - classificationpublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Livanova USA, Inc.
100 Cyberonics Boulevard
Houston, Texas 77058 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / STUBBS, Scott
c/o Cyberonics Inc.
100 Cyberonics Blvd.
Houston Texas 77058 / US
02 / LIBBUS, Imad
c/o Cyberonics Inc.
100 Cyberonics Blvd.
Houston Texas 77058 / US
03 / MAZAR, Scott
c/o Cyberonics Inc.
100 Cyberonics Blvd.
Houston Texas 77058 / US
04 / KENKNIGHT, Bruce H.
c/o Cyberonics Inc.
100 Cyberonics Blvd.
Houston Texas 77058 / US
05 / AMURTHUR, Badri
c/o Cyberonics Inc.
100 Cyberonics Blvd.
Texas Houston 77058 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813868.112.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36990
Priority number, dateUS20161518117713.06.2016         Original published format: US201615181177
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218400
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468456
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/36
[2020/09]
Former International [2019/16]A61B5/00, A61B5/08, A61N1/00, A61N1/05, A61N1/08, A61N1/18, A61N1/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:NEUROSTIMULATOR MIT TITRIERASSISTENT[2019/16]
English:NEUROSTIMULATOR WITH TITRATION ASSIST[2019/16]
French:NEUROSTIMULATEUR AYANT UNE ASSISTANCE AU TITRAGE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Search fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2016129256  (LIBBUS IMAD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012192874  (BOLEA STEPHEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2005049655  (BOVEJA BIRINDER R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2005222626  (DILORENZO DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010168820  (MANIAK JEREMY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * (U1.U/.GUlU) entire document *