Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469218

EP3469218 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SUPPLYING POWER FLUID TO A WELL PRESSURE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Noble Drilling Services, Inc.
13135 S. Dairy Ashford Road
Suite 800
Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DEUL, Hans, H., J.
3035 Arabian Court
Richmond TX 77406 / US
02 / O'NEILL, Patrick
905 Town and Country Blvd
Houston, TX 77024 / US
03 / VAN KUILENBURG, Robert
4819 Whitby Circle
Sugar Land TX 77479 / US
04 / SIBREL, Matthew
10123 Antelope Alley
Missouri City TX 77459 / US
 [2019/25]
Former [2019/16]01 / DEUL, Hans, H., J.
3035 Arabian Court
Richmond TX 77406 / US
02 / O'NEILL, Patrick
12643 Pebblebrook Dr
Houston TX 77024 / US
03 / VAN KUILENBURG, Robert
4819 Whitby Circle
Sugar Land TX 77479 / US
04 / SIBREL, Matthew
10123 Antelope Alley
Missouri City TX 77459 / US
Representative(s)Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton, York YO26 6QY / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813906.913.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37169
Priority number, dateUS201662349686P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349686 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218481
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469218
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F15B1/00, F15B1/02, F15B1/027, E21B33/06, E21B33/064, E21B34/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ZUFÜHRUNG VON DRUCKFLÜSSIGKEIT ZU EINER BOHRLOCHDRUCKSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SUPPLYING POWER FLUID TO A WELL PRESSURE CONTROL DEVICE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR FOURNIR DU FLUIDE DE PUISSANCE À UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION DE PRESSION DE PUITS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Search fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3338302  (Hubby) [X] 1-2, 4-5, 7 and 9 * , Fig. 1, col. 2, In. 55 - col. 3, In. 75 * [Y] 3, 6 and 8;
 [Y]FR2796105  (Elf Exploration Production) [Y] 3 and 6 * , Fig. 1 *;
 [Y]US2012090850  (Botich) [Y] 8 * , Fig. 13, para [0087] *;
 [A]US3516491  (Lewis) [A] 1-9 * , Fig. 2, col. 4, In. 12 - col. 6, In. 29 *;
 [A]US3921500  (Silcox) [A] 1-9 * , Fig. 3, col. 8, In. 66 - col. 10, In. 25 *