Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468580

EP3468580 - METHODS FOR SELECTING AND TREATING PATIENTS WITH A TRAIL-BASED THERAPEUTIC OR DEATH RECEPTOR AGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merrimack Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
One Kendall Square Suite B7201
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DAKE, Tamara
33 Essex Street
Sharon MA 02067 / US
02 / GHASSEMIFAR, Sara
6400 Christie Ave, Apt 4106
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
03 / HASHAMBHOY-RAMSAY, Yasmin
12 Chandler Street
Watertown MA 02472 / US
04 / MARCANTONIO, Diana, Hung-yi Chai
337 Harrington Avenue
Concord MA 01742 / US
05 / TAM, Eric, M.
152 Pearl Street Apt 2
Cambridge MA 02139 / US
06 / YUZUGULLU, Haluk
124 Carlisle Street
Newton MA 02459 / US
 [2019/21]
Former [2019/16]01 / DAKE, Tamara
33 Essex Street
Sharon MA 02067 / US
02 / GHASSEMIFAR, Sara
3920 Mystic Valley Parkway Apt. 602
Medford MA 02155 / US
03 / HASHAMBHOY-RAMSAY, Yasmin
12 Chandler Street
Watertown MA 02472 / US
04 / MARCANTONIO, Diana, Hung-yi Chai
337 Harrington Avenue
Concord MA 01742 / US
05 / TAM, Eric, M.
152 Pearl Street Apt 2
Cambridge MA 02139 / US
06 / YUZUGULLU, Haluk
124 Carlisle Street
Newton MA 02459 / US
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17813935.813.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37259
Priority number, dateUS201662349497P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349497 P
US201762458824P14.02.2017         Original published format: US 201762458824 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218540
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468580
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/19, A61P35/00, C12Q1/68
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL UND BEHANDLUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT EINEM TRAIL-BASIERTEN THERAPEUTISCHEN ODER TODESREZEPTORAGONISTEN[2019/16]
English:METHODS FOR SELECTING AND TREATING PATIENTS WITH A TRAIL-BASED THERAPEUTIC OR DEATH RECEPTOR AGONIST[2019/16]
French:MÉTHODES DE SÉLECTION ET DE TRAITEMENT DE PATIENTS AVEC UN AGONISTE D'UN RÉCEPTEUR DE MORT CELLULAIRE OU UN COMPOSÉ THÉRAPEUTIQUE À BASE DE TRAIL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
22.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: IL
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
16.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2006017531  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-8, 13-15 * page 47 lines 16-38, claims 14, 17, 19, 20, 24, 25 * [Y] 9;
 [X]WO2011159928  (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [X] 1, 13 * paragraphs 0165, 0177, 0217, claims 16-20 *;
 [Y]US2013302270  (SPITZER DIRK [US], et al) [Y] 9 * (SEQ ID NOs: 5-12) *