Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471793

EP3471793 - Y-CONNECTOR FOR BLOOD PROCESSING SYSTEM AND DISPOSABLE SET CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haemonetics Corporation
400 Wood Road
Braintree, MA 02184 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MCDOWELL, Christopher S.
4650 S 700 E
Murray, Utah 84107 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Somervell, Thomas Richard
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street
Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814012.514.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37459
Priority number, dateUS201662350930P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350930 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218663
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471793
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/02, A61M1/36, B01D61/00, A61K35/14, A61M1/34, B01D37/00, B04B11/04, B04B15/06, C12N5/078, A61M39/22, B01D21/26, B01D35/02, B01D35/00, B01D39/00, B01D61/14, B01D61/18, B01D69/00, C12M1/12, C12N5/02, G01N1/10, G01N33/48
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:Y-VERBINDER FÜR BLUTVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND EINWEGSET DAMIT[2019/17]
English:Y-CONNECTOR FOR BLOOD PROCESSING SYSTEM AND DISPOSABLE SET CONTAINING SAME[2019/17]
French:RACCORD EN Y POUR SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DU SANG ET ENSEMBLE JETABLE LE CONTENANT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Search fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
04.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYA]US6312950  (OHMURA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2, 14, 23, 24, 30, 32, 34 * , entire document, Col. 6, Ins. 52-67; Col. 12, Ins. 7-20, 66-67; Col. 13, Ins. 1-6, 13-17; Col. 14, Ins. 51-58 * [Y] 3-5, 7-13, 15-17, 25-27, 29 [A] 6, 18-22, 28, 31, 33;
 [YA]US5971948  (PAGES ETIENNE [FR], et al) [Y] 3-5, 7, 25-27, 29 * , entire document, Col. 4, Ins. 3435, Col. 5, Ins. 64-67, Col. 6, line 1, Fig. 2 * [A] 6, 28;
 [Y]US6855119  (RIVERA JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 8, 13 * , entire document, Col. 3, Ins. 23 -42, Fig. 5 *;
 [Y]US6358420  (BLICKHAN BRYAN J [US], et al) [Y] 9-12 * , entire document, Col. 1, Ins. 5863 *;
 [Y]US2012136341  (APPLING WILLIAM M [US], et al) [Y] 15-17 * , entire document, para [0003], [0099], [0103], Fig. 1 *;
 [Y]US5951519  (UTTERBERG DAVID S [US]) [Y] 4, 26 * , entire document, Col. 1, Ins. 4-9, 54-61' Col. 2, Ins. 50-53, 55-56, Fig. 2 *;
 [Y]US5160615  (TAKAGI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 5, 27 * , entire document, Col. 2, Ins. 3 -7, Col. 4, Ins. 45-51; Figs. 1, 4 *;
 [Y]US6220453  (KITAJIMA MASAO [JP], et al) [Y] 7, 29 * , entire document, Col. 12, Ins. 2021 *;
 [A]US2004238444  (RAGUSA MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-34 * , entire document, para [0011] -[0014], [0018], [0027], [0031], Fig. 2 *;
 [A]US5527472  (BELLOTTI MARC [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * , entire document *;
 [A]US5954971  (PAGES ETIENNE [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * , entire document *;
 [A]US5112298  (PRINCE PAUL R [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * , entire document *;
 [A]US4707335  (FENTRESS PHILIP W [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * , entire document *