Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469650

EP3469650 - BATTERY MODULES AND SYSTEMS FOR REMOTE COMMAND AND CONTROL OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Waters, John E.
10671 Geist Ridge Court
Fishers, IN 46040 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Warren, Caroline Elisabeth
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17814023.214.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37495
Priority number, dateUS201662349761P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349761 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218679
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469650
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H01M2/34, H01M2/20, H01M2/30, H01M2/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BATTERIEMODULE UND SYSTEME ZUR FERNSTEUERUNG UND STEUERUNG DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:BATTERY MODULES AND SYSTEMS FOR REMOTE COMMAND AND CONTROL OF SAME[2019/16]
French:MODULES DE BATTERIE ET SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE À DISTANCE ET DE COMMANDE DE CEUX-CI[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2014045024  (WATERS JOHN E [US]) [X] 4, 6-10 * See paragraphs [0023], [0024], [0026], [0027]; claim 1. * [Y] 1-3, 5;
 [Y]WO9952170  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-3, 5 * See page 16, paragraph 3 - page 17, paragraph 1; page 17, paragraph 3 page 18, paragraph 1; page 32, paragraph 4. *;
 [A]US2016093456  (DULLE RONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0020], [0031], [0034], [0037]; claims 1, 11; figures 3, 4. *;
 [A]US4289836  (LEMELSON JEROME H) [A] 1-10 * See column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 66, column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 3; figures 1, 2. *;
 [A]US6773839  (FUGLEVAND WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See column 4, lines 15-65, column 5, lines 47-55, column 8, lines 5-14; figure 2. *