Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468573

EP3468573 - TREATMENT OF CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vedanta Biosciences, Inc.
19 Blackstone Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Jessica
10 Rogers Street
Unit 506
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
02 / KIM, Yun-Gi
77 Waverley Avenue
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
03 / OLLE, Bernat
68 Brookline Street
Apt. 104
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / REDDY, Shilpa
375 Mt Auburn Street
Apt. 2R
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
05 / NORMAN, Jason
179 Norton Street
North Weymouth, MA 02191 / US
06 / PATARROYO, Juan
1073 Massachusetts Avenue
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
 [2019/32]
Former [2019/16]01 / SCHNEIDER, Jessica
444 Windsor Street
Unit 2
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
02 / KIM, Yun-Gi
77 Waverley Avenue
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
03 / OLLE, Bernat
68 Brookline Street
Apt. 104
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / REDDY, Shilpa
375 Mt Auburn Street
Apt. 2R
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
05 / NORMAN, Jason
179 Norton Street
North Weymouth, MA 02191 / US
06 / PATARROYO, Juan
1073 Massachusetts Avenue
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
Representative(s)EIP
EIP Europe LLP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17814024.014.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37498
Priority number, dateUS201662349914P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349914 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218680
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468573
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/74, A61K35/742, C12N1/20
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON CLOSTRIDIUM-DIFFICILE-INFEKTIONEN[2019/16]
English:TREATMENT OF CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE INFECTION[2019/16]
French:TRAITEMENT D'UNE INFECTION PAR CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
23.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]US2014328803  (MCKENZIE GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 14, 15 * . Especially para [0090], [0099], [0509], pg 53 Table 1, pg 55 Table 1, SEQ ID NOs: 376, 590 * [Y] 39-41, 47 [A] 19-21;
 [Y]  - "Blautia hansenii strain JCM 14655 16S ribosomal RNA gene, partial sequence", NUCLEOTIDE, (20150203), Database accession no. NR_104687, URL: NCBI, XP055448967 [Y] 39-41, 47 * . Especially pg 1 *