Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469419

EP3469419 - INTEGRATION OF ELECTROCHROMIC FILMS ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Furcifer Inc.
1455 Adams Drive
Suite 1650
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Jian
38034 Village Common
Apt. 213
Fremont, CA 94536 / US
02 / ZHOU, Yan
38271 Paseo Padre Parkway
Fremont, CA 94025 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Branderhorst, Matthijs Pieter Arie
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17814025.714.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37510
Priority number, dateUS201662349841P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349841 P
US20171539985206.01.2017         Original published format: US201715399852
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218682
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469419
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/15, A01M29/06, C01B25/30, C01D15/10, C03C17/23, C09K9/02, G02F1/01
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:INTEGRATION VON ELEKTROCHROMEN SCHICHTEN AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT[2019/16]
English:INTEGRATION OF ELECTROCHROMIC FILMS ON A SUBSTRATE[2019/16]
French:INTÉGRATION DE FILMS ÉLECTROCHROMIQUES SUR UN SUBSTRAT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2007153355  (HUANG LEE-MAY [TW], et al) [Y] 1, 2 * entire document *;
 [Y]WO2014121263  (HPO ASSETS LLC [US]) [Y] 1, 2 * entire document *;
 [Y]US5825526  (BOMMARITO SILVIA L [US], et al) [Y] 2 * entire document *;
 [A]US7864398  (DOZEMAN GARY J [US], et al) [A] 1, 2 * entire document *