Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468601

EP3468601 - SENSITIZATION OF TUMORS TO THERAPIES THROUGH ENDOGLIN ANTAGONISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cedars-Sinai Medical Center
8700 Beverly Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BHOWMICK, Neil
1721 N. Beverly Drive
Beverly Hills, California 90210 / US
02 / SMITH, Bethany
9005 Burton Way
Apt. 605
Los Angeles, California 90048 / US
03 / PLACENCIO, Veronica
12405 Weddington Street
Apt.20
Valley Village, California 91607 / US
04 / MADHAV, Anisha
600 N. East Street
Woodland, California 95776 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Elsy, David
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17814046.314.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37558
Priority number, dateUS201662350017P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350017 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218708
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468601
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, A61K31/337, A61K31/4045, A61K31/44, A61K31/282, C07K16/28
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SENSIBILISIERUNG VON TUMOREN GEGENÜBER THERAPIEN ENDOGLINANTAGONISMUS[2019/16]
English:SENSITIZATION OF TUMORS TO THERAPIES THROUGH ENDOGLIN ANTAGONISM[2019/16]
French:SENSIBILISATION DE TUMEURS À DES THÉRAPIES PAR ANTAGONISME DE L'ENDOGLINE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Search fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2016009811  (TRACON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.) [X] 1-24 * claims 1-10, 13-20; para [0900]-[0920] *
 [X]  - KARZAI et al., "A phase I study of TRC105 anti-endoglin ( CD 105) antibody in metastatic castration -resistant prostate cancer", BJU Int., (20150000), vol. 116, no. 4, pages 546 - 555, XP055463722 [X] 1, 4-8, 11-24 * ; Abstract, pg 547, col 1; pg 553, col 2; pg 554, col 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/bju.12986
 [X]  - ZIEBARTH et al., "Endoglin ( CD 105) contributes to platinum resistance and is a target for tumor- specific therapy in epithelial ovarian cancer", Clin Cancer Res., (20130000), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 170 - 182, XP055449350 [X] 1-3, 9, 10 * ; Abstract, pg 12 [according to the posted document] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-1045