Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472511

EP3472511 - LIGHT RAY CONCENTRATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 05.02.2020 [2020/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tang, Paul, E.
370 Imperial Way No. 313
Daly City, CA 94015 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814054.714.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37571
Priority number, dateUS201662350092P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350092 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218716
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472511
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:F21S11/00, G02B19/00, H01L31/054
[2020/06]
Former International [2019/17]F21V5/00, G02B27/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:LICHTSTRAHLENKONZENTRATOR[2019/17]
English:LIGHT RAY CONCENTRATOR[2019/17]
French:CONCENTRATEUR DE RAYONS LUMINEUX[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2018National basic fee paid 
13.12.2018Search fee paid 
13.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US7428367  (LUBART NEIL D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; figure 4, column 3 lines 7-16, 61-66, column 4 lines 22-24, 52-55 *;
 [A]US2014240839  (YANG CHING-AN [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; figure 6a, paragraphs [0066-0067], [0070], [0073] *;
 [A]US2007002452  (MUNRO JAMES F [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; figure 1, paragraphs [0048-0049] *;
 [A]US4297000  (FRIES JAMES E) [A] 1-20 * ; column 1 lines 4-15, column 2 lines 2-22, 29-43, column 3 lines 12-14 *;
 [A]US2011186106  (PARKER REGINALD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; paragraphs [0037-0038], [0043] *