Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3472511 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3472511



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 100
28.01.2020 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.01.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.01.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 5
09.01.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
09.01.2020 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
12.12.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
05.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.08.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
05.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
13.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.12.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32