Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3472511


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.01.2020 Supplementary search report published on  05.02.2020  [2020/06]
03.01.2020 Change - classification published on  05.02.2020  [2020/06]
03.01.2020 Change - classification published on  05.02.2020  [2020/06]
16.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
13.08.2019 Amendment by applicant
03.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
26.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
08.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
14.12.2018 Change - representative
14.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
28.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication