blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3471631
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018001056Global Dossier 04.01.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201715672916 09.08.2017
US201762489643 25.04.2017
US201662351159 16.06.2016
WO2017US37609 15.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3471631Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201762489643 25.04.2017
US201662351159 16.06.2016
WO2017US37609 15.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017218734Global Dossier 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201762489643 25.04.2017
US201662351159 16.06.2016