Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471631

EP3471631 - SYSTEMS, APPARATUSES, AND METHODS FOR GUIDE WIRE DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Farapulse, Inc.
3715 Haven Avenue
Menlo Park, California 94025 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LEEFLANG, Stephen A.
975 Larkspur Ave.
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
02 / EVERSULL, Christian S.
1563 Mariposa Ave.
Palo Alto, California 94306 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814062.015.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37609
Priority number, dateUS201662351159P16.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351159 P
US201762489643P25.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762489643 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218734
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471631
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/11
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE EINES FÜHRUNGSDRAHTES[2019/17]
English:SYSTEMS, APPARATUSES, AND METHODS FOR GUIDE WIRE DELIVERY[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈMES, APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DISTRIBUTION DE FIL DE GUIDAGE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Search fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
21.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2015182740  (UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION) [Y] 1-3, 5-35, 43-48 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para[0071]-[0075], para[0094]-[0095], [0103] -[0106] and FIGS. 1-8. * [A] 4, 36-42;
 [YA]US2007260223  (SCHEIBE et al.) [Y] 1-3, 5-35, 43-48 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para[0019]-[0021] and FIG. 1. * [A] 4, 36-42;
 [Y]US7374567  (HEUSER) [Y] 9-10 * Entire document, especially Abstract, FIG. 9. *;
 [A]US5895404  (RUIZ) [A] 1-48 * Entire document. *;
 [A]US2012089089  (SWAIN et al.) [A] 1-48 * Entire document. *;
 [A]US5624430  (ETON et al.) [A] 1-48 * Entire document. *;
 [A]US8795310  (FUNG et al.) [A] 1-48 * Entire document. *;
 [A]US7387636  (COHN et al.) [A] 1-48 * Entire document. *;
 [A]US6985776  (KANE et al.) [A] 1-48 * Entire document. *