Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471990

EP3471990 - SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR INDUCTION-BASED POWER HARVESTING IN BATTERY-POWERED VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FerrarisPower Co., Ltd
A-401, Pangyo Digital Center(PDC)
242, Pangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do
13487 / KR
For all designated states
Koo, Ja-Il
4119 124th Ave. SE 301
Bellevue, Washington 98006 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KOO, Ja-Il
4119 124th Ave. SE 301
Bellevue, Washington 98006 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Fulton, David James , et al
Lincoln IP 9 Victoria Street
Aberdeen AB10 1XB / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814088.515.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37668
Priority number, dateUS201662350329P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350329 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218768
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471990
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60L5/00, B60L9/00, B60L11/18, G05D1/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR INDUKTIONSBASIERTEN ENERGIEGEWINNUNG IN BATTERIEBETRIEBENEN FAHRZEUGEN[2019/17]
English:SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR INDUCTION-BASED POWER HARVESTING IN BATTERY-POWERED VEHICLES[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS DE COLLECTE D'ÉNERGIE À BASE D'INDUCTION DANS DES VÉHICULES ALIMENTÉS PAR BATTERIE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Search fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
30.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US7318564  (MARSHALL PATRICK T [US]) [X] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012056040  (BROTHERTON-RATCLIFFE DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US4904996  (FERNANDES ROOSEVELT A [US]) [A] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012290164  (HANSON BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010100342  (KRESSNER A ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US8167234  (MOORE MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US2015041598  (NUGENT THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US2004083940  (SHELTON CHRIS D [GB], et al) [A] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010280675  (TATE JR EDWARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * entire document *;
 [A]US2009256361  (THEUSS HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1-39 * entire document *