Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472442

EP3472442 - POWER SYSTEM WITH INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Next Generation Engines LLC
5620 Queens Kew
Bonita Springs, CA 34134 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / TURNER, Alfred, A.
5620 Queens Kew
Bonita Springs, FL 34134 / US
02 / MCCRICKARD, Edmond, Eugene
4002 Clovercroft Road
Franklin, TN 37067 / US
03 / ROBERTS, Thomas, Lee
1270 Beachmont
Ventura, CA 93001 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
8th Floor
140 London Wall
London EC2Y 5DN / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814126.315.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37751
Priority number, dateUS20161518412016.06.2016         Original published format: US201615184120
US20161527923728.09.2016         Original published format: US201615279237
US20171562269114.06.2017         Original published format: US201715622691
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218823
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472442
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F02B1/08, B01D53/22, B01D53/32, F02M25/12, F02M33/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM MIT VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2019/17]
English:POWER SYSTEM WITH INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION À MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US6516787  (DUTART CHARLES H [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * entire document *;
 [A]US2007266995  (HA YEONGGIL [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * entire document *;
 [A]US2013037003  (SHEERIN GEOFFREY T [CA]) [A] 1-7 * entire document *;
 [A]US5267535  (LUO JIH-TZANG [TW]) [A] 1-7 * entire document *;
 [A]US3901009  (BUTLER LEE D, et al) [A] 1-7 * entire document *