Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472618

EP3472618 - PATTERNING GRAPHENE WITH A HARD MASK COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nanomedical Diagnostics, Inc.
6185 Cornerston Court East, Suite 110
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PAN, Deng
Nanomedical Diagnostics Inc.
6185 Cornerstone Court
East Suite 110
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / GOLDSMITH, Brett
Nanomedical Diagnostics Inc.
6185 Cornerstone Court
East Suite 110
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17814130.515.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37764
Priority number, dateUS201662350629P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350629 P
US20171562327914.06.2017         Original published format: US201715623279
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218833
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472618
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, G01N27/414, H01L21/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:STRUKTURIERUNG VON GRAPHEN MIT EINER HARTMASKENBESCHICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:PATTERNING GRAPHENE WITH A HARD MASK COATING[2019/17]
French:FORMATION DE MOTIFS SUR DU GRAPHÈNE À L'AIDE D'UN REVÊTEMENT DE MASQUE DUR[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US9349825  (FENG ZHIHONG [CN], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-16 * ; abstract; figures 1-6 and 15; column 1, lines 52-57; column 2, lines 13-45; column 4, lines 9-20 and 41-60; column 5, line 2-16. * [Y] 17-18;
 [X]US2015371848  (ZARETSKI ALIAKSANDR [US], et al) [X] 1, 4, 13, 19 * ; figures 1 and 6; paragraphs [0006, 0009, 0012, 0030-0031, 0040, 0044, 0049, 0050, 0064]. *;
 [Y]US2015303059  (FRIEDMAN ADAM L [US], et al) [Y] 17-18 * ; paragraph [0022]. *;
 [A]US2015038378  (CHENG MARK MING-CHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; entire document *