Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472553

EP3472553 - EDGE REGISTRATION FOR INTERFEROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, New York 14831 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DUNN, Thomas, James
61 Edenfield Road
Penfield, New York 14526 / US
02 / MICHALOSKI, Paul, Francis
343 Rockingham Street
Rochester, New York 14620 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date17814147.916.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37810
Priority number, dateUS201662351609P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351609 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218860
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472553
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01B9/02, G01N21/84, G01N21/88, G01N21/21, G02B27/58, G03F1/84, G01N21/31
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KANTENREGISTRIERUNG FÜR DIE INTERFEROMETRIE[2019/17]
English:EDGE REGISTRATION FOR INTERFEROMETRY[2019/17]
French:ENREGISTREMENT DES CONTOURS DESTINÉ À UNE INTERFÉROMÉTRIE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5561525  (TOYONAGA SHUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 4-15 * column 4, line 50 - line 52; figure 3 *;
 [IY]US4139302  (HUNG YAU Y, et al) [I] 1-3 * column 7, line 29 - line 54; figures 1,4,5 * [Y] 4-15;
 [A]US2003132405  (SOME DANIEL I [IL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - YELLESWARAPU CHANDRA S ET AL, "Fourier phase contrast multimodal optical microscopy for real time display of phase and fluorescence at the same time", NOVEL BIOPHOTONIC TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20110609), vol. 8090, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.889375, pages 1 - 10, XP060015243 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.889375
International search[XYA]US5561525  (TOYONAGA SHUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 3/1, 11 * , Fig. 3, col. 4 In. 50 to col. 6 In. 32 * [Y] 2, 3/2, 5, 6, 7/5, 7/6, 10, 12 [A] 13/11, 13/12, 14/13/11, 14/13/12;
 [YA]US2011075928  (JEONG HWAN J [US], et al) [Y] 2, 3/2, 5, 6, 7/5, 7/6, 10, 12 * , Fig. 1A, para. [0136], [0143], [0149], [0151], [0167], [0168], [0206], [0207] * [A] 13/11, 13/12, 14/13/11, 14/13/12;
 [A]US2012274931  (OTANI YUKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3, 5-7, 10-14 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2012075606  (NELSON MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 5-7, 10-14 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2012307258  (KOERNER KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-3, 5-7, 10-14 * , entire document *